(HC) Clarke v. SCSO et al
Petitioner: Lee K. Clarke and Lee Kelly Clarke
Respondent: SCSO and People of California
Case Number: 2:2022cv00026
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lee Kelly Clarke. (Kaminski, H)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:22-CV-26 JAM JDP. (Reader, L)
January 28, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: [ 5 ] Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Lee Kelly Clarke. (Reader, L)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/26/2022 ORDERING petitioner shall submit, within 30 days, either an affidavit in support of his request to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee. Petitioner's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. The Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form. (Yin, K)
January 27, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and ifp form served on Lee K. Clarke. (Yin, K)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
January 5, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lee K. Clarke. (Benson, A.)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against People of California, SCSO by Lee K. Clarke.(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Clarke v. SCSO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee K. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee Kelly Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SCSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?