Canales, et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward Canales and Susan Bilbo Canales
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00042
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 1471 Federal Aviation Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/22/2022 GRANTING the United States until 3/24/2022 to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. (Coll, A)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by United Airlines, Inc.. Attorney Cutler, Michael added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cutler, Michael)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Summons served on John Montego on 2/7/22. (Thiel, Mark) Modified on 2/10/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United Airlines, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark A. Thiel* *3439 Brookside Road Suite 205* *Stockton, CA 95219*. (Kastilahn, A)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant by Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10003400) (DUPLICATE RECEIPT ACAEDC-10003360 FOR $402 HAS BEEN REFUNDED) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thiel, Mark) Modified on 1/6/2022 (Washington, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canales, et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Canales
Represented By: Mark A. Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bilbo Canales
Represented By: Mark A. Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?