(HC) Tavera-Ugarte v. Thompson
Petitioner: Jose Tavera-Ugarte
Respondent: Paul Thompson
Case Number: 2:2022cv00067
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, A.)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jose Tavera-Ugarte. (Coll, A)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Paul Thompson by Jose Tavera-Ugarte. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Tavera-Ugarte v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Tavera-Ugarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Thompson
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?