(HC) Lopez Diaz v. People of the State of Calfornia
Petitioner: Javier Lopez Diaz
Respondent: People of the State of Calfornia
Case Number: 2:2022cv00252
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Javier Lopez Diaz. (Huang, H)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kaminski, H)
February 28, 2022 RECEIPT number #CAE200119596 $5.00 fbo Javier Lopez Diaz by Ella Pilipovich on 3/1/2022. (Coll, A)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/9/2022 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, either an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Henshaw, R)
February 10, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP application served on Javier Lopez Diaz. (Henshaw, R)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
February 8, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Javier Lopez Diaz. (Benson, A.)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Javier Lopez Diaz (Benson, A.)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against People of the State of Calfornia by Javier Lopez Diaz.(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Lopez Diaz v. People of the State of Calfornia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Lopez Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of Calfornia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?