(HC) Chappell v. Kiebler
Petitioner: Blake Chappell
Respondent: B. Kiebler
Case Number: 2:2022cv00259
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Blake Chappell (Benson, A.)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Blake Chappell, CDC AB-6428 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Blake Chappell. (Benson, A.)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/22/22 ORDERING within 30 days from the date of this order, Petitioner shall submit an affidavit insupport of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Plummer, M)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Blake Chappell. (Plummer, M)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on Blake Chappell with CDCR# AB-6428. (Yin, K)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Blake Chappell. (Rodriguez, E)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against B. Kiebler by Blake Chappell. (Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Chappell v. Kiebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blake Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Kiebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?