(HC) Abila v. Covello
Petitioner: Angelo Alex Abila
Respondent: P. Covello
Case Number: 2:2022cv00264
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to STAY by Angelo Alex Abila. (Licea Chavez, V)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/2022 ORDERING petitioner has 30 days to inform the court whether he intends to proceed on his two exhausted claims only or requests a stay of this action in order to exhaust his unexhausted claims. If petitioner requests a stay of this action, petitioner shall file a motion to stay pursuant to Rhines or Kelly within 30 days. If petitioner requests a stay pursuant to Rhines, he shall file an amended petition containing both his exhausted and unexhausted claims. (Yin, K)
March 22, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Angelo Alex Abila. (Yin, K)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kastilahn, A)
February 11, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: CAED Receipt, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Angelo Alex Abila. (Kastilahn, A)
February 11, 2022 RECEIPT number #CAE200119291 $5.00 fbo Angelo Alex Abila by State of California on 2/11/2022. (Kastilahn, A)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against P. Covello by Angelo Alex Abila.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Abila v. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angelo Alex Abila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?