Peters v. Yee
Plaintiff: Jan Peters
Defendant: Betty T. Yee
Case Number: 2:2022cv00266
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 38 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
February 10, 2022 Filing 37 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-04929.
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT STATE CONTROLLER BETTY T. YEE'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE [filed 1/12/22; Docket No. #27 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Case transferred electronically. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
February 2, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California #27 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
February 2, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Defendant's Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Statement of Decision RE Motion to Transfer Venue re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California #27 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Statement of Decision Granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Yen, Jerry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 33 REQUEST for Relief from File Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #28 filed by plaintiff Jan Peters. Request set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California #27 Defendant State Controller Betty T. Yee's Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Betty T. Yee. (Yen, Jerry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 31 STATEMENT Joint Statement RE: Meet and Confer on Plaintiff's Contemplated Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Jan Peters (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 28, 2022 Filing 29 Request for Relief to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiff Jan Peters re: Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #28 (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 28 Opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California #27 filed by Plaintiff Jan Peters. (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California filed by Defendant Betty T. Yee. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Margit Miller in support of Betty Yee's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue) (Yen, Jerry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 26 DECLARATION of William W. Palmer filed by Plaintiff Jan Peters. (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
January 7, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Jerry T. Yen on Meet and Confer RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California #23 Declaration of Jerry T. Yen on Meet and Confer RE: Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Betty T. Yee. (Yen, Jerry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
December 29, 2021 Filing 24 Text Entry Order: Defendant State Controller Betty T. Yees Motion to Transfer Venue, filed on December 28, 2021 (Docket No. #23 ), is STRICKEN for failure to comply with paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Standing Order, which requires the Joint Statement to be filed three days after the Local Rule 7-3 Conference. If Defendant wishes to re-file the Motion, lead counsel shall meet and confer in person by January 10, 2022. If the parties cannot resolve the issues raised in the Motion, within 3 days of the meet and confer, each party shall file a declaration setting forth the issues resolved at the conference and those issues that were not resolved with a detailed explanation of why those issues could not be resolved. If a Motion remains necessary, it shall not be filed until 2 days after each party files the declaration required by this Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
December 28, 2021 Filing 23 *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California filed by Defendant Betty T. Yee. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Margit Miller in Support of Defendant State Controller Betty T. Yee's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue) (Yen, Jerry) Modified on 1/5/2022 (sr). [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for hearing on 7/29/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/9/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on October 25, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar.A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: March 7, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: March 11, 2022. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Jan Peters.. (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for October 25, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before October 12, 2021. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jerry T. Yen Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Betty T. Yee. (Yen, Jerry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Defendant Betty T. Yee's Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Betty T. Yee.(Yen, Jerry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Betty T. Yee answer now due 9/3/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Betty T. Yee.(Attorney Jerry T Yen added to party Betty T. Yee(pty:dft))(Yen, Jerry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM JULY 2, 2021 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #12 by Judge John F. Walter. The Order to Show Cause is dismissed and this Court accepts the filing of the Declaration of Lead Counsel, no further sanctions are ordered. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re REQUEST for Relief from From July 2, 2021 Order to Show Cause re Declaration #11 , Order to Show Cause, #10 #12 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for Relief from From July 2, 2021 Order to Show Cause re Declaration #11 , Order to Show Cause, #10 filed by Plaintiff Jan Peters. (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of William W. Palmer filed by Plaintiff Jan Peters. (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel is ordered to show cause in writing by July 6, 2021 why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $750.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jan Peters, identifying Betty T. Yee. (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Betty T. Yee. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jan Peters. (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jan Peters. (Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31484095 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Jan Peters. (Attorney William W Palmer added to party Jan Peters(pty:pla))(Palmer, William) [Transferred from cacd on 2/10/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Peters
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty T. Yee
Represented By: Jerry Tongwei Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?