(HC) Kopp v. Martinez
Petitioner: Jason Charles Kopp
Respondent: Martinez
Case Number: 2:2022cv00280
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition served on Tami Krenzin pursuant to #6 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition. (Yin, K)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/29/2022 DIRECTING respondent to file a response to the petition within 60 days. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Yin, K)
March 30, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Jason Charles Kopp. (Yin, K)
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE re Copies and State Bar Filings by Jason Charles Kopp. (Huang, H)
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jason Charles Kopp re #3 Consent/Decline of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Kaminski, H)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kaminski, H)
February 23, 2022 RECEIPT number #CAE200119485 $5.00 HC Filing Fee fbo Jason Charles Kopp by Debr Jean Koester on 2/23/2022. (Reader, L)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
February 15, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jason Charles Kopp. (Benson, A.)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Martinez by Jason Charles Kopp. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Kopp v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Charles Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?