Dunn v. Austin et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dunn
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin, III, Frank Kendall, Gregory M. Haynes, Jeffrey Pennington and United States Department of Defense
Case Number: 2:2022cv00288
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Public Accomodations)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/13/22 ORDERING that the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including May 2, 2022. (Kaminski, H)
April 13, 2022 Filing 28 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, by Lloyd J. Austin, III, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall, Jeffrey Pennington, United States Department of Defense. (Robinson, Stuart)
April 5, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: As to Department of Defense; Lt. Col. Haynes on 2/17/2022, 2/22/2022, 2/23,2022 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Molloy, Thomas) Modified on 4/12/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
March 16, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stuart Robinson on behalf of Lloyd J. Austin, III, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall, Jeffrey Pennington, United States Department of Defense. Attorney Robinson, Stuart added. (Robinson, Stuart)
March 8, 2022 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/8/2022: On March 4, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. See ECF No. #24 . Having reviewed Plaintiff's arguments, the Court DENIES the instant Motion for the same reasons stated at the hearing denying the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
March 4, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Pending Appeal by Jonathan Dunn. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Falk, Donald)
March 3, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Donald Falk on behalf of Jonathan Dunn. Attorney Falk, Donald added. (Falk, Donald)
February 28, 2022 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion for preliminary injunction held on 2/22/2022, before District Judge John A. Mendez, filed by Jennifer Coulthard, Phone number 530-537-9312 E-mail jenrmrcrr2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 3/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2022. (Coulthard, Jennifer)
February 28, 2022 Filing 21 USCA CASE NUMBER 22-15286 for #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Dunn. (Coll, A)
February 25, 2022 Filing 20 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Dunn. Notice of Appeal filed *2/24/2022*, Complaint filed *2/14/2022* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *2/22/2022*. Court Reporter: *J. Coulthard*. *Fee Status: Paid on 2/24/2022 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Coll, A)
February 24, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of APPEAL by Jonathan Dunn. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ACAEDC-10093779) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Molloy, Thomas)
February 24, 2022 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jonathan Dunn for proceedings held on 2/23/2022 before Judge Judge Mendez. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Molloy, Thomas)
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lloyd J. Austin, III et al for proceedings held on 2/22/2022 before Judge Mendez. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Enlow, Courtney)
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTES for proceedings held via video conference before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 2/22/2022. T. Molloy appeared via video for Plaintiff. C. Enlow appeared via video for Defendants. Plaintiff present via video. The Court DENIED Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order converted to a Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter: J. Coulthard. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
February 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Jonathan Dunn in support of #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Molloy, Thomas) Modified on 2/22/2022 (Coll, A).
February 21, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY to RESPONSE to #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Jonathan Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Molloy, Thomas) Modified on 2/22/2022 (Coll, A).
February 18, 2022 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Lloyd J. Austin, III et al to #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Proposed Order)(Enlow, Courtney)
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/18/2022: Plaintiff filed a Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") on February 15, 2022. See ECF No. #4 . The Court ordered Defendants' file an opposition by noon on Friday, February 18, 2022. See ECF No. 6 . The Court will be converting Plaintiff's Motion for a TRO into a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The hearing is SET for February 22, 2022 at 1:30 pm via video. Plaintiff shall file his reply by noon on February 21, 2022. Both parties shall submit proposed orders along with their briefing. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Courtney Danielle Enlow on behalf of all defendants. Attorney Courtney Danielle Enlow ADDED. (Enlow, Courtney)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan Dunn re #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Jonathan Dunn. (Molloy, Thomas)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/17/2022 GRANTING #8 Request to Seal; ORDERING that the Affidavit at ECF #4 -2 be SEALED; ORDERING Plaintiff to file the redacted Affidavit as described in Plaintiff's Request to Seal. (Michel, G.)
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST TO SEAL Affidavit of Jonathan Dunn by Jonathan Dunn. (Molloy, Thomas)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES in support of #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Jonathan Dunn. (Molloy, Thomas)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/15/2022: Plaintiff filed a Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order on February 15, 2022. See ECF No. #4 . Defendants' opposition brief is due by noon on Friday, February 18, 2022. Plaintiff's reply brief is due by noon on Tuesday, February 22, 2022. The Court will resolve the pending motion on the briefs. If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Molloy, Thomas)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Jonathan Dunn. Motion Hearing SET for 2/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 TRO Checklist, #2 [SEALED - see #9 Order] Affidavit of Jonathan Dunn, #3 Affidavit of Thomas Molloy, #4 Proposed Order re TRO, #5 Proposed Order re Hearing) (Molloy, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2022 (Michel, G.).
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lloyd J. Austin, III, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall, Jeffrey Pennington, United States Department of Defense* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas Murphy Molloy, Jr* *Waco* *1125 Wedgewood Dr.* *Woodway, TX 76702*. (Huang, H)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jonathan Dunn. Attorney Molloy, Thomas Murphy added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10076089) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molloy, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Austin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dunn
Represented By: Thomas Murphy Molloy, Jr
Represented By: Donald Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin, III
Represented By: Courtney Danielle Enlow
Represented By: Stuart Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kendall
Represented By: Courtney Danielle Enlow
Represented By: Stuart Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory M. Haynes
Represented By: Courtney Danielle Enlow
Represented By: Stuart Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Pennington
Represented By: Courtney Danielle Enlow
Represented By: Stuart Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Courtney Danielle Enlow
Represented By: Stuart Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?