(PC)Woodard v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Daray D. Woodard
Defendant: E. Hobbs, C. Enos, M. Banks, J. Bordewick, K. Fenika, B. Corralejo, Hightower, Peirce and Patrick Covello
Case Number: 2:2022cv00317
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/23/2022. (for E-Service) (Yin, K)
March 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *J. Bordewick, Patrick Covello, and Hightower* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daray D. Woodard BG-7172* *California State Prison, Los Angeles County* *P.O. Box 8457* *Lancaster, CA 93539-8457*. (Yin, K)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/23/2022 FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendants: *Patrick Covello*, *Bordewick*, and *Hightower*. Defendants Hobbs, Enos, Banks, Fenika, Corralejo, and Peirce are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. The Clerk shall serve this order via email on the CDCR, along with a summons, the Operative Complaint, the Order re Consent and Notice of E-Service Waiver. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Waiver) (Yin, K)
March 23, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate served on Daray D. Woodard. (Yin, K)
March 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ELECTION by Daray D. Woodard. electing to proceed solely as to his Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Warden Patrick Covello, Sgt. Bordewick and CCI Hightower. (Coll, A)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Daray D. Woodard signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/28/22. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also served Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/28/22 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the Director of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation filed concurrently herewith. Claims against defendants Hobbs, Enos, Banks, Fenika, Corralejo, and Peirce are dismissed with leave to amend. Within thirty days of service of this order, plaintiff may amend his complaint to attempt to state cognizable claims against these defendants. Plaintiff is not obliged to amend his complaint. The allegations in the pleading are sufficient to state potentially cognizable claims against defendants Warden Patrick Covello, Sgt. Bordewick and CCI Hightower. If plaintiff elects to proceed forthwith as to such defendants, the court will issue an order to the U.S. Marshal to execute service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Defendants Covello, Bordewick and Hightower will be required to respond to plaintiff's allegations within the deadlines stated in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1). In this event, the court will construe plaintiff's election to proceed forthwith as consent to an order dismissing his defective claims against defendants Hobbs, Enos, Banks, Fenika, Corralejo, and Peirce without prejudice.. (Plummer, M)
February 28, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on Daray D. Woodard. (Plummer, M)
February 28, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Daray D. Woodard. (Plummer, M)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 22, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Daray D. Woodard. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Daray D. Woodard. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against M. Banks, J. Bordewick, B. Corralejo, C. Enos, K. Fenika, Hightower, E. Hobbs by Daray D. Woodard.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Woodard v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daray D. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Enos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bordewick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Fenika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Corralejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peirce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?