Henao et al v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Henao, Angela Henao and J. Michael Hopper
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Jennifer Rodriguez, Seleena Ulahannan, Williams and Nickerson
Case Number: 2:2022cv00352
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Filing 27 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Denny Yu for Jennifer Rodriguez (Yu, Denny)
January 19, 2023 Filing 26 ANSWER with Jury Demand by County of Sacramento, Nickerson, Seleena Ulahannan, Williams.(Motooka, Wendy)
January 18, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Jennifer Rodriguez.(Cahill, Nicole)
January 5, 2023 Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph Henao, J. Michael Hopper. Attorney Park, Samuel added.(Park, Samuel)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/19/22 GRANTING #17 Motion to Dismiss. Not later than 20 days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, Plaintiff may, but is not required to, file an amended complaint. If no amended complaint is timely filed, this action will be dismissed with prejudice upon no further notice to the parties. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 9, 2022 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER re #17 Motion to Dismiss by Jennifer Rodriguez. (Cahill, Nicole) Modified on 12/12/2022 (Perdue, C.).
December 8, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 17). The moving party is directed to file a proposed order for consideration of the filing. Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in word processing format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
September 30, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY by Jennifer Rodriguez re #19 Opposition to Motion. (Cahill, Nicole)
September 21, 2022 Filing 19 OPPOSITION by Angela Henao to #17 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Michael Hopper, #2 Declaration of Angela Henao, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Park, Samuel)
September 8, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the October 13, 2022, hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #17 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
September 7, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to DISMISS by Jennifer Rodriguez. Attorney Cahill, Nicole M added. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice and Exhs RJ-1 - RJ-5)(Cahill, Nicole)
September 7, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Longyear, Dayton)
September 7, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Jennifer Rodriguez. Attorney Longyear, Dayton Van Vranken added.(Longyear, Dayton)
August 31, 2022 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Christopher Loren Janof terminated (Motooka, Wendy)
August 8, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jennifer Rodriguez served on 08/02/2022 (Powell, Robert) Modified on 8/10/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 [DISREGARD - COUNSEL TO REFILE WITH CAPTION PAGE] SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jennifer Rodriguez served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Powell, Robert) Modified on 8/3/2022 (Benson, A.).
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand by County of Sacramento, Nickerson, Seleena Ulahannan, Williams. Attorney Janof, Christopher Loren added.(Janof, Christopher)
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Williams on 5/31/2022, Answer due 8/1/2022 (Powell, Robert)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Samuel Park. (Park, Samuel)
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Powell, Robert)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 05/24/2022 Extending time for defendant to file and serve their Responsive Pleading to plaintiffs' Complaint no later than 05/23/2022. (Rodriguez, E)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by County of Sacramento.(Janof, Christopher)
May 13, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for an Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by County of Sacramento. Attorney Paul, Jonathan B. added. (Paul, Jonathan)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Sacramento served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Powell, Robert)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Sacramento, Nickerson, Jennifer Rodriguez, Seleena Ulahannan, Williams* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Ross Powell* *Powell & Associates* *925 West Hedding Street* *San Jose, CA 95126*. (Rodriguez, E)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph Henao, Angela Henao. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10090217) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Powell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henao et al v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Henao
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Samuel Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Henao
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Represented By: Samuel Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Michael Hopper
Represented By: Samuel Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Jonathan B. Paul
Represented By: Christopher Loren Janof
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rodriguez
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Nicole M Cahill
Represented By: Denny Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seleena Ulahannan
Represented By: Christopher Loren Janof
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Represented By: Christopher Loren Janof
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickerson
Represented By: Christopher Loren Janof
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?