Wells et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wells and Cindy Wells
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00498
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher James Campbell on behalf of Kenneth Wells, Cindy Wells. Attorney Campbell, Christopher James added. (Campbell, Christopher)
July 17, 2023 Filing 17 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL terminating Ariel Harman-Holmes by All Plaintiffs. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/18/2023 (Benson, A.).
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/13/23 GRANTING #15 Joint Request For Additional Time Re: the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order and CONTINUING the deadlines/dates as follows: Completion of All Fact Discovery: 11/6/23; Expert Witness Disclosures & Report (Initial): 1/5/24; Expert Witness Disclosures & Report (Rebuttal): 2/5/24; Exchange of Any Supplemental disclosures and responses (including expert supplemental materials): 3/5/24; Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 5/6/24; Deadline to File Joint Notice of Trial Readiness: Not later than 30 days after receiving this Court's ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s); Joint Notice of Trial Readiness: 3/5/24. (Kastilahn, A)
June 13, 2023 Filing 15 JOINT REQUEST for Additional Time re: Deadlines in Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order by Kenneth Wells, Cindy Wells. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. LaRocque, #2 Proposed Order)(LaRocque, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/13/2023 (Krueger, M).
June 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A LaRocque on behalf of Kenneth Wells, Cindy Wells. Attorney LaRocque, Elizabeth A added. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James P. Mayo on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
June 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/06/2022. Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US, LLC in place of attorney Jon D. Universal. (Rodriguez, E)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by FCA US, LLC. (Mayo, James)
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Kenneth Wells, Cindy Wells. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jon D. Universal on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Universal, Jon D. added. (Universal, Jon)
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mayo, James)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James P. Mayo on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Mayo, James)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC. Attorney Mayo, James P. added. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Mayo, James)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: FCA US LLC served on 3/17/2022. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 3/29/2022 (Huang, H).
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *Strategic Legal Practices, Apc* *1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Kaminski, H)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations against FCA US LLC by Kenneth Wells, Cindy Wells. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10127792) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jeep Cherokee Express Warranty, #2 Civil Cover Sheet).(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wells
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Wells
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon D. Universal
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?