Alvi v. Eads
Plaintiff: Rehan S. Alvi
Defendant: James Eads
Case Number: 2:2022cv00500
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/13/2022: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 7/14/2022 is ADVANCED to 6/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Rehan S. Alvi to #7 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rehan S. Alvi, #2 Declaration of Benjamin J. Tolman, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Tolman, Benjamin)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by James Eads. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Eads, #2 Declaration of Stuart G. Gross, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Gross, Stuart)
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Travis Smith on behalf of James Eads. Attorney Smith, Travis added. (Smith, Travis)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stuart G. Gross on behalf of James Eads. Attorney Gross, Stuart G. added. (Gross, Stuart)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: James Eads served on 3/18/2022. (Tolman, Benjamin) Modified on 4/12/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *James Eads* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Benjamin J. Tolman* *201 Spear Street, Suite 1100* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Kaminski, H)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Eads by Rehan S.Alvi. Attorney Tolman, Benjamin J. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10128811) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tolman, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvi v. Eads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rehan S. Alvi
Represented By: Benjamin J. Tolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eads
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Represented By: Travis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?