Shankland v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Holly Shankland
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00518
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher James Campbell on behalf of Holly Shankland. Attorney Campbell, Christopher James added. (Campbell, Christopher)
July 17, 2023 Filing 21 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL terminating Ariel Harman-Holmes by All Plaintiffs. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/19/2023 (Benson, A.).
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 7/6/2023, CONTINUING Trial and related dates as follows: All Discovery Cut-Off 12/15/2023; Initial Expert Disclosures 10/6/2023; Supplemental Expert Disclosures 10/20/2023; Last Day to file Dispositive Motions 1/26/2024; Hearing on Dispositive Motions 4/9/2024 at 1:30 p.m. Final Pretrial Conference SET for 6/7/2024 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial SET for 7/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 3, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Trial Date and related dates by Holly Shankland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(LaRocque, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/5/2023 (Benson, A.).
July 3, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A LaRocque on behalf of Holly Shankland. Attorney LaRocque, Elizabeth A added. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 03/08/2023 CONTINUING the dates as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 07/07/2023 with any supplemental/rebuttal expert disclosures due by 07/21/2023; Litigation Discovery Report due by 09/01/2023; Discovery completed by 09/15/2023; Dispositive Motions be filed by 10/27/2023 and heard 12/12/2023 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez., Jury Trial set for 4/8/2024 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Rodriguez, E)
February 28, 2023 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Trial and Related Dates by Holly Shankland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) Modified on 3/1/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/15/22 ORDERING that all Dispositive Motions be filed by 06/23/23 and heard 08/22/23 1:30 p.m.; Discovery completed by 05/12/23; joint mid-litigation statements due 14 days prior to close of discovery; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 03/10/23 with any supplemental/rebuttal expert disclosures due by 03/24/23; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/06/23 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez with a joint pretrial statement due 7 days prior; Jury Trial set for 11/27/23 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 7 days. (Benson, A.)
August 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Suarez, Jeanette Catuira added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 [DISREGARD; noncompliant] JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Holly Shankland. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) Modified on 8/15/2022 (Michel, G.).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/09/2022 SUSTITUTING Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US, LLC. in place of Attorney Michael Benjamin Sachs. (Rodriguez, E)
August 8, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by FCA US, LLC. (Sachs, Michael)
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/29/2022: The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report pursuant to the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26, in accordance with Local Rule 240 and the Court's Order Requiring Service of Process and Joint Status Report, within fourteen (14) days. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: FCA US, LLC served on 3/22/2022. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/15/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Holly Shankland, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Holly Shankland. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC to #1 Complain. Attorney Sachs, Michael Benjamin added.(Sachs, Michael) Modified on 4/13/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Holly Shankland. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *Strategic Legal Practices, APC* *1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Huang, H)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC by Holly Shankland. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10132848) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shankland v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Shankland
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Sachs
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?