(HC) Mims v. Burton
Petitioner: George Mims
Respondent: Robert Burton
Case Number: 2:2022cv00521
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Troy L Nunley
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/10/2022 GRANTING #8 Motion to Proceed IFP. Petitioner may file an amended 2254 habeas corpus petition within 30 days of this order's entry. (Perdue, C.)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order and federal habeas form served on George Mims. (Perdue, C.)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by George Mims. (Perdue, C.)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/19/2022: Pursuant to the senior status of District Judge John A. Mendez, this case is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley for all further proceedings. District Judge John A. Mendez is no longer assigned to case. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:22-cv-0521 TLN JDP (HC). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Donati, J)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Order Reassigning Case served on George Mims. (Donati, J)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/11/21 DIRECTING the Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, either an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee.(Licea Chavez, V)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and IFP served on George Mims. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Perdue, C.)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:22-cv-0521-JAM-JDP (HC). (Huang, H)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on George Mims. (Huang, H)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on George Mims with corrected CDCR No. G-58487. (Yin, K)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Licea Chavez, V)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on George Mims. (Licea Chavez, V)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Robert Burton by George Mims.(Licea Chavez, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Mims v. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?