(HC) Henry v. Burton
Petitioner: Robert Henry
Respondent: Robert Burton
Case Number: 2:2022cv00609
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 RECEIPT number #CAE200120591 $5.00 fbo Robert Henry by State of CA on 5/2/2022. (Kastilahn, A)
May 2, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: CAED Receipt served on Robert Henry. (Kastilahn, A)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/22/22 ORDERING petitioner shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Plummer, M)
April 22, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Robert Henry. (Plummer, M)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, A.)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Perdue, C.)
April 7, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Robert Henry. (Perdue, C.)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Robert Burton by Robert Henry.(Perdue, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Henry v. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?