(PS) Abukalam v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Mohamed Abukalam
Defendant: California Dept of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Robert Burton and Erik Pedersen
Case Number: 2:2022cv00674
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Robert Burton, California Dept of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Erik Pedersen. Attorney Abbasciano, Stefano added. (Attachments: #1 Decline of Jurisdiction)(Abbasciano, Stefano) Modified on 5/18/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Mohamed Abukalam on Robert Burton re #8 First Amended Conmplaint. (Perdue, C.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Mohamed Abukalam on Erik Pederson re #8 First Amended Complaint. (Perdue, C.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Mohamed Abukalam on Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation re #8 First Amended Complaint. (Perdue, C.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Burton, California Dept of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Erik Pedersen by Mohamed Abukalam.(Perdue, C.)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Robert Burton served on 4/26/2022. (Kaminski, H)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Dept of Corrections and Rehabilitation served on 4/26/2022. (Kaminski, H)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Erik Pedersen served on 4/26/2022. (Kaminski, H)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Informational Order) (Kastilahn, A)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Robert Burton, California Dept of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Erik Pedersen* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Mohamed Abukalam* *9521 Emerald Park Dr, #7* *Elk Grove, CA 95624*. (Kastilahn, A)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mohamed Abukalam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/18/2022) (Kastilahn, A).
April 18, 2022 SERVICE IN PERSON: #3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM, #2 Summons served on Mohamed Abukalam. (Kastilahn, A)
April 18, 2022 RECEIPT number #CAE200120434 $402.00 fbo Abukalam Mohamed by Abukalam Mohamed on 4/18/2022. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Abukalam v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Abukalam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Dept of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Stefano Abbasciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Burton
Represented By: Stefano Abbasciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Pedersen
Represented By: Stefano Abbasciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?