(PS) Sharma et al v. HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1 et al
Plaintiff: Vinod Sharma and Vijay L. Sharma
Defendant: HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1 and HSI Asset Securitization Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00928
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/28/2022 RECOMMENDING that #9 Motion to Remand be denied, and #7 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Plaintiffs' complaint be dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of the Court be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Findings and Recommendations, served on Vijay L. Sharma, Vinod Sharma. (Reader, L)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING proceedings held via videoconference on 7/27/2022 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Pro Se Plaintiffs Vinod Sharma and Vijay Sharma, present. Defense Counsel, Mark Rackers, present. The pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #7 ) and Motion to Remand (ECF No. #9 ) are SUBMITTED. Written order to issue. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 17 Minutes re Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2022 served on Vijay L. Sharma and Vinod Sharma. (Kennison, L)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY by Vijay L. Sharma, Vinod Sharma to #13 Opposition to Motion. (Reader, L)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of HEARING re #9 Motion to Remand by Vijay L. Sharma, Vinod Sharma. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Reader, L) Modified on 7/20/2022 (Benson, A.).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY by HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1, HSI Asset Securitization Corporation to #11 "late filed" Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rackers, Mark) Modified on 7/20/2022 (Benson, A.).
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPPOSITION by HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1, HSI Asset Securitization Corporation to #9 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mark Rackers (Exhibits 1-2), #2 Proof of Service)(Rackers, Mark)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER to #9 Motion to Remand by Vijay L. Sharma, Vinod Sharma. (Coll, A)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Vijay L. Sharma, Vinod Sharma to #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Coll, A)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/23/2022: The court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (ECF No. #9 ). The motion, as filed, is defective. Plaintiffs are directed to comply with Local Rule 230(b) and notice the motion for a hearing to take place before the assigned Magistrate Judge on July 27, 2022, to be heard at the same time as Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #7 ). (Text Only Entry)(Streeter, J)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Minute Order served on Vijay L. Sharma, Vinod Sharma. (Streeter, J)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to REMAND by Vijay L. Sharma, Vinod Sharma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1, HSI Asset Securitization Corporation re #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Rackers, Mark)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1, HSI Asset Securitization Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Rackers, Mark)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rackers, Mark)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Anna Jane I. Zarndt on behalf of HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1, HSI Asset Securitization Corporation. Attorney Zarndt, Anna Jane I. added. (Zarndt, Anna Jane)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:20-cv-00921-JAM-KJN by HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1, HSI Asset Securitization Corporation. (Rackers, Mark)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1 re #2 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Rackers, Mark)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00260806 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10255230) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Proof of Service)(Rackers, Mark)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Vijay L. Sharma, Vinod Sharma. (Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Sharma et al v. HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinod Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vijay L. Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSI Asset Loan Obligation Trust 2007-1
Represented By: Mark Gerard Rackers
Represented By: Anna Jane I. Zarndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSI Asset Securitization Corporation
Represented By: Mark Gerard Rackers
Represented By: Anna Jane I. Zarndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?