Gabriel v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Plaintiff: Ronell Gabriel
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00958
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Flesher, Jacob)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Attorney Flesher, Jacob D. added.(Flesher, Jacob)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 6/6/2022. (Petru, Anthony) Modified on 6/10/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Union Pacific Railroad Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony S. Petru* *350 Frank H. Ogawa Plaza* *4th Floor* *Oakland, CA 94612-2006*. (Coll, A)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronell Gabriel by Ronell Gabriel. Attorney Petru, Anthony S. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10262324) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Petru, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronell Gabriel
Represented By: Anthony S. Petru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Jacob D. Flesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?