Cherry et al v. Strategic Properties of North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julius Cherry and Gerald Glazer
Defendant: Strategic Properties of North America, LLC and Saul Kuperwasser
Case Number: 2:2022cv00999
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
2 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
3 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 07/29/22 GRANTING the Defendants until 08/31/22 to respond to the complaint.(Licea Chavez, V)
July 28, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Saul Kuperwasser, Strategic Properties of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Johnny)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/28/22 EXTENDING deadline for defendants to respond to the Complaint to 07/29/22. (Benson, A.)
June 28, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Strategic Properties of North America, LLC. (White, Johnny)
June 28, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint< by Saul Kuperwasser, Strategic Properties of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Johnny)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Saul Kuperwasser, Strategic Properties of North America, LLC re #6 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (White, Johnny)
June 16, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/14/2022 ORDERING that this case be RELATED to case number 2:21-CV-01770-TLN-DB and that this case be REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings; any dates currently set in this matter are VACATED. The new case number is 2:22-CV-00999-TLN-DB. (Rodriguez, E)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-cv-01770-TLN by Saul Kuperwasser, Strategic Properties of North America, LLC. (White, Johnny)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Saul Kuperwasser, Strategic Properties of North America, LLC (White, Johnny)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento, case number 34-2022-00319001 by Julius Cherry, Gerald Glazer. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10271850) (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - Complaint, #2 EXHIBIT B - Summons, #3 EXHIBIT C - Court Order)(White, Johnny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry et al v. Strategic Properties of North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Cherry
Represented By: Peter F. Samuel
Represented By: Steven H. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Glazer
Represented By: Peter F. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Properties of North America, LLC
Represented By: Johnny White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Kuperwasser
Represented By: Johnny White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?