Olfati v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Parvin Olfati
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Pamela Pisani, Jennifer Reiman, Jennifer Stewart and Ronald Briggs
Case Number: 2:2022cv01127
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER TO SEVER AND REMAND signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/18/2022, REMANDING CASE to Sacramento Superior Court. Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 10, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ronald Briggs, County of Sacramento, Pamela Pisani, Jennifer Reiman, Jennifer Stewart.(Whitefleet, John)
August 9, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy N. Cannarozzi: In light of the Clerk's Notice 13 reassigning the matter to Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, the 9/8/2022 initial scheduling conference #10 previously set before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is VACATED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/9/2022. (Text Only Entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
August 9, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:22-CV-1127-KJM-JDP. (Rodriguez, E)
August 5, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kamp, Steven)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 07/29/222 SETTING Initial Scheduling Conference for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM conducted remotely via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson (Zoom invitation will be distributed one week prior) with status reports due 14 days prior to the conference. The parties shall complete and file the Consent to Assignment or Request for Reassignment form within 7 days. (Benson, A.)
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION re Service of Process by Parvin Olfati. (Kamp, Steven) Modified on 8/1/2022 (Benson, A.).
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Sever and Remand by Parvin Olfati. (Kamp, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2022 (Zignago, K.).
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand to the First Amended Complaint, by Ronald Briggs, County of Sacramento, Pamela Pisani, Jennifer Reiman, Jennifer Stewart.(Fessenden, Carl) Modified on 7/21/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Ronald Briggs, County of Sacramento, Pamela Pisani, Jennifer Reiman, Jennifer Stewart. (Fessenden, Carl)
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Ronald Briggs, County of Sacramento, Pamela Pisani, Jennifer Reiman, Jennifer Stewart. (Fessenden, Carl)
July 11, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Ronald Briggs, et al. (Fessenden, Carl) Modified on 7/15/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
June 29, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
June 29, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE to ADVERSE PARTY of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court by et al. (Fessenden, Carl)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00310164 by all defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Suli A. Mastorakos)(Fessenden, Carl)
June 29, 2022 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10304809. (Fessenden, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olfati v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parvin Olfati
Represented By: Steven M. Kamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Pisani
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Reiman
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Briggs
Represented By: Carl L. Fessenden
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?