(PS)Alexis v. Navarro et al
Plaintiff: Kiara Dorique Alexis
Defendant: Jack Navarro Doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Rochelle Matkin Doing business as Quality Loan Service Corporation and Robert Holliday Doing business as Paramount Residential Mortgage Service Group
Case Number: 2:2022cv01130
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
2 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from District Judge *Kimberly J. Mueller* to * District Judge Dale A. Drozd* for all further proceedings. (Benson, A.)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #26 Order Reassigning District Judge, served on Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Benson, A.)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/22/2022 re #18 Motion to Dismiss and #20 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing on the motions now calendared for Wednesday, September 28, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/22/22 DENYING #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and DENYING #15 Motion for TRO. Matter is REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge for all further proceedings. (Benson, A.)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Order served on Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Benson, A.)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 25 Minute Order served on Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Anderson, J)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Stevenson, Richard)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Stevenson, Richard)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Jack Navarro in re #20 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stevenson, Richard)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to DISMISS by Jack Navarro. Attorney Stevenson, Richard L. added. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Stevenson, Richard)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Rochelle Matkin in re #18 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stevenson, Richard)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by Rochelle Matkin. Attorney Stevenson, Richard L. added. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Stevenson, Richard)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kaminski, H)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Kiara Dorique Alexis re #15 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #14 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Kaminski, H)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Kaminski, H)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Kaminski, H)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/16/2022 VACATING #3 Motion for Injunctive Relief. It is further RECOMMENDED that the #1 Complaint be Dismissed with leave to amend and that plaintiff be allowed to file an amended complaint within 30 days of a ruling on these Findings and Recommendations. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Coll, A)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT and ACCEPTANCE OF WARRANT GRANT DEED by Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Licea Chavez, V)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/11/2022: The court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motions for Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO"), filed at ECF No. #10 , and Preliminary Injunction, filed at ECF No. #9 . The exhibits in support of the Motions, however, do not sufficiently meet Plaintiff's burden to show that (1) Plaintiff's house is being sold on 8/22/2022; and (2) Plaintiff provided notice of these Motions to the other parties. Although based on the current record the court cannot grant the requested TRO or set a preliminary injunction hearing at this time, Plaintiff may attempt to supplement the record to cure these defects. The Request for a TRO is DENIED without prejudice to such supplementation, if possible. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order, filed at ECF No. 11, served on Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Licea Chavez, V)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION Preliminary Injunction by Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Licea Chavez, V)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens and Notice of Action Pending by Kiara Dorique Alexis (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Perdue, C.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Perdue, C.)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Kastilahn, A)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Robert Holliday, Rochelle Matkin, Jack Navarro* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Kiara Dorique Alexis* *520 W. Harding Way* *Stockton, CA 95204*. (Kastilahn, A)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Summons, #6 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Kastilahn, A)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: CAED Receipt served on Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Kastilahn, A)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200121920 $402.00 fbo Kiara Dorique Alexis by Kiara Dorique Alexis on 7/14/2022. (Kastilahn, A)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/30/2022 DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee no later than 07/15/2022 or this case will be dismissed for failure to pay the filing fee. (Rodriguez, E)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Rodriguez, E)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Kastilahn, A)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MOTION for PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Kastilahn, A)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Kastilahn, A)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kiara Dorique Alexis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS)Alexis v. Navarro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiara Dorique Alexis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Navarro Doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Richard L. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Matkin Doing business as Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Holliday Doing business as Paramount Residential Mortgage Service Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?