Avalos-Aviles v. Red Robin International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jose Jesus Avalos-Aviles
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc. Doing business as Red Robin Burger and Spirits Emporiums
Case Number: 2:2022cv01257
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
2 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) CIVSB2202216, 2:23-CV-03338 JFW by Red Robin International, Inc.. (Siegel, Adam)
April 4, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/4/2023: On 4/3/2023, the parties filed a joint #20 stipulation to modify the scheduling order. Good cause appearing, and consistent with District Judge Dale A. Drozd's case scheduling practices, the court grants the parties' #20 request to modify the scheduling order as follows: Fact discovery shall be completed by 10/2/2024; Expert disclosures shall be completed by 11/1/2024; Rebuttal expert disclosures shall be completed 12/2/2024; Expert discovery shall be completed by 1/3/2025; All dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications shall be filed no later than 2/17/2025 and be noticed for hearing on a date consistent with Judge Drozd's #6 Standing Order and on a date no more than 60 days after the filing of the motion. In addition, the Final Pretrial Conference currently set for 6/4/2024 is hereby RESET for 7/22/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Drozd by Zoom, and the Jury Trial currently set for 8/5/2024 is hereby RESET for 10/6/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Buzo, P)
April 3, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION to AMEND #15 Scheduling Order and Continue Trial by Red Robin International, Inc.. (Vigodnier, Martin) Modified on 4/4/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
March 8, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/8/2023: On 3/7/2023, the parties filed a #18 stipulation requesting court approval of their agreed-upon process to allow putative class members to personally assert their right to privacy using the procedure set forth in Belaire-West Landscape, Inc. v. Superior Court, 149 Cal. App. 4th 554, 556 (2007), wherein putative class members will be provided notice and an opportunity to exclude their personal information from disclosure by defendant to plaintiff's counsel. Pursuant to that #18 stipulation and good cause appearing, the court hereby orders as follows: CPT is appointed as the third-party administrator for the limited purpose of providing notice as set forth in the parties' #18 stipulation; the parties' agreed-upon sampling of putative class member information is discoverable by plaintiff; and administrator CPT and the parties shall complete the notice procedure by the dates agreed upon in the parties' #18 stipulation.(Buzo, P)
March 7, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Notice to putative class members by Jose Jesus Avalos-Aviles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tabatabaeepour, Roxanna) Modified on 3/8/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/17/2023. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 7, 2023 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Jose Jesus Avalos-Aviles. (Tabatabaeepour, Roxanna) Modified on 2/8/2023 (Perdue, C.).
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/2/22 VACATING the 11/15/22 scheduling order. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 8/2/23. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/1/2023 and experts rebuttal disclosure due by 10/2/23. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than 11/1/23. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed on or before 12/18/23. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 6/4/2024 at 01:30 PM and the Jury Trial is SET for 8/5/2024 at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Kastilahn, A)
November 1, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jose Jesus Avalos-Aviles. (Tabatabaeepour, Roxanna)
October 10, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER by Red Robin International, Inc..(Siegel, Adam)
September 8, 2022 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Red Robin International, Inc. by Jose Jesus Avalos-Aviles.(Tabatabaeepour, Roxanna)
September 8, 2022 Filing 11 **AMENDED** MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/8/2022. On September 7, 2022, the parties filed a #9 joint stipulation to allow plaintiff to file a first amended complaint. Pursuant to that #9 stipulation and good cause appearing, plaintiff shall file the first amended complaint no later than 7 days from the date of this order. Defendant shall file a response to the first amended complaint no later than 30 days after the first amended complaint is filed. The #4 Motion to Amend is RENDERED MOOT.(Buzo, P)
September 8, 2022 Filing 10 **DISREGARD** MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/8/202. On September 7, 2022, the parties filed a #9 Joint Stipulation to allow plaintiff to file a first amended complaint. Pursuant to that #9 stipulation and good cause appearing, plaintiff shall file the first amended complaint no later than 7 days from the date of this order. Defendant shall file a response to the first amended complaint no later than 30 days after the first amended complaint is filed.(Buzo, P) Modified on 9/8/2022 (Buzo, P).
September 7, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Filing Amended Complaint by Jose Jesus Avalos-Aviles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order. Villalba, Orlando) Modified on 9/8/2022 (Kaminski, H).
September 7, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/7/2022. The hearing on plaintiff's #4 Motion for leave to file a first amended complaint currently set for 10/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is RESET to 10/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are referred to District Judge Dale A. Drozd's #6 Standing Order for Zoom appearance information.(Buzo, P)
September 2, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Donati, J)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/25/2022. (Donati, J)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from District Judge *Kimberly J. Mueller* to * District Judge Dale A. Drozd* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to AMEND #1 Notice of Removal, by Jose Jesus Avalos-Aviles. Attorney Tabatabaeepour, Roxanna added. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Tabatabaeepour, Roxanna) Modified on 8/26/2022 (Kaminski, H).
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Red Robin International, Inc.. (Vigodnier, Martin)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00320877 by Red Robin International, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10331417) (Attachments: #1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Declaration of Jared Kulka, #3 Declaration of Adam Y. Siegel, #4 Declaration of Kelly McGrew, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vigodnier, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos-Aviles v. Red Robin International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jesus Avalos-Aviles
Represented By: Orlando Villalba
Represented By: Roxanna Tabatabaeepour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc. Doing business as Red Robin Burger and Spirits Emporiums
Represented By: Adam Y. Siegel
Represented By: Martin Paul Vigodnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?