(PC) DeOllas v. Sacramento County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene DeOllas, II
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Office and Sacramento County
Case Number: 2:2022cv01280
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Anthony Eugene DeOllas, II signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/29/2022. The appropriate agency is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the Clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the appropriate agency. (cc: Financial)(Huang, H)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/29/2022 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The sufficiency of #1 Complaint and service thereof will be addressed separately. (Huang, H)
August 1, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on Anthony Eugene DeOllas II. #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and #2 Motion for IFP served on Sacramento County Mail Jail, Attn: Inmate Trust Accounts, 651 I Street, Sacramento, California 95814. (Huang, H)
July 27, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
July 21, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
July 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony Eugene DeOllas II. (Benson, A.)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony Eugene DeOllas, II. (Benson, A.)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Anthony Eugene DeOllas, II.(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) DeOllas v. Sacramento County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene DeOllas, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?