(PC) Hill v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Cymeyon V. Hill and Cymeyon Hill
Defendant: S. Patterson, A. Scotland, R. M. Torrez and Suziqvi
Case Number: 2:2022cv01328
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 09/19/2022 ADOPTING #7 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 30 days of the service of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee or face dismissal of the case. This matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Rodriguez, E)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Cymeyon Hill. (Rodriguez, E)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Cymeyon V. Hill. (Licea Chavez, V)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Perdue, C.)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/2/2022 DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to randomly assign a United States District Judge to this action, and RECOMMENDING #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be denied, and that Plaintiff be given 30 days to pay the filing fee or face dismissal of the case. District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire assigned for all further proceedings. Referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. New Case Number: 2:22-cv-1328-TLN-AC (PC). (Huang, H)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Cymeyon V. Hill. (Huang, H)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:22-cv-03927.
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Cymeyon V. Hill. (Maldonado, C)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order case electronically transmitted to the Eastern District of California. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) [Transferred from cand on 7/27/2022.]
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/26/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/27/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Cymeyon V. Hill. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2022) [Transferred from cand on 7/27/2022.]
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cymeyon V. Hill, CDCR # V53300.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022) [Transferred from cand on 7/27/2022.]
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under a Prisoner Civil Rights against S. Patterson, A. Scotland, Suziqvi, R. M. Torrez (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Cymeyon V. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022) [Transferred from cand on 7/27/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hill v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cymeyon V. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cymeyon Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Scotland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. M. Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suziqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?