Thorco Projects A/S v. Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thorco Projects A/S
Defendant: Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01331
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Troy L Nunley
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PRO HACE VIC ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/22 GRANTING #22 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney William Robert Bennett, III, PHV for Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/22 GRANTING #23 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Noe Sebastian Hamra, PHV for Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20//22 GRANTING #27 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Briton P. Sparkman, PHV for Thorco Projects A/S. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/22 GRANTING #24 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Lauren Brooke Wilgus, PHV for Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Kastilahn, A)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/8/22 DENYING #14 defendant's Ex Parte Application. However, based on the updated estimate from Plaintiff and pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(6), the property of Defendant may be reduced upon the posting of a cash remittance or surety bond in the amount of USD $5,000,000. (Kastilahn, A)
September 8, 2022 Filing 28 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via Video Conferencing before District Judge Troy L. Nunley held on 9/8/2022: The Court heard oral arguments on Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Reduce Security (ECF No. #14 ) and the matter was SUBMITTED. The Court to issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel Frank Brucculeri and Briton Sparkman present. Defendants Counsel Wei Lun Allen Ho and Lauren Wilgus present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Krueger, M)
September 8, 2022 Filing 27 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Thorco Projects A/S for attorney Briton P. Sparkman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10428746) (Brucculeri, Frank)
September 6, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER by Thorco Projects A/S.(Brucculeri, Frank)
September 2, 2022 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/2/2022: The parties are hereby notified that the Hearing on Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Reduce Security (ECF No. #14 ) will be held by Video Conferencing on 9/8/2022 at 2:00 PM and the parties will receive instructions on how to appear closer to the hearing date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 1, 2022 Filing 24 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc. for attorney Lauren Brooke Wilgus to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10419851) (Ho, Wei Lun)
September 1, 2022 Filing 23 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc. for attorney Noe Sebastian Hamra to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10419849) (Ho, Wei Lun)
September 1, 2022 Filing 22 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc. for attorney William Robert Bennett, III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10419848) (Ho, Wei Lun)
September 1, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/1/2022: The Court hereby SETS a Hearing on Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Reduce Security (ECF No. #14 ) for 9/8/2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 25, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY by Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc. re #14 Ex Parte Application. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Biltoo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ho, Wei Lun). Modified on 8/26/2022 (Kaminski, H).
August 22, 2022 Filing 19 OPPOSITION by Thorco Projects A/S to #14 Ex Parte Application. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Thomas Mikkelsen, #2 Declaration Ian Richard Short, #3 Proposed Order)(Brucculeri, Frank)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/19/2022 EXTENDING The deadline for Garnishee Trans-Hold Inc. to file an Answer and answers to interrogatories served upon it on 7/29/2022 pursuant to Rule B(3) of the Supplemental Rules For Admiralty Or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions from 8/19/2022, to 9/16/2022. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 18, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Garnishee to file Answer and Answers to Interrogatories by Thorco Projects A/S. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brucculeri, Frank)
August 18, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on August 18, 2022: Plaintiff shall file its Response to Defendant's Ex Parte Application (ECF No. #14 ) no later than 5:00 PM on August 22, 2022. Defendant may file a Reply no later than 5:00 PM on August 25, 2022. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Intention to Oppose #14 Ex Parte Application and Request for Briefing Schedule by Thorco Projects A/S. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brucculeri, Frank) Modified on 8/19/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
August 17, 2022 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc. to Reduce Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ho, Wei Lun)
August 16, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM and Demand for Countersecurity Pursuant to Supplemental Admiralty Rule E(7) against Thorco Projects A/S by Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc., by Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ho, Wei Lun) Modified on 8/18/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
August 16, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/16/2022: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion to Reduce Security (ECF No. #11 ). The Motion as filed is deficient and Counsel for Defendant is directed to file a properly noticed motion in compliance with Local Rule 230(a) and (b). The law and motion dates for District Judge Troy L. Nunley may be found on the Court's website. Accordingly, the motion is TERMINATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 12, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Reduce Security by Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.. Attorney Ho, Wei Lun Allen added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Ho, Wei Lun) Modified on 8/15/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Thorco Projects A/S served on 7/29/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. (Rose, Bradley)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/28/2022 GRANTING #8 Ex Parte Application APPOINTING a special process server pursuant to supplemental Rule B. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Thorco Projects A/S for Motion For An Order Appointing A Special Process Server Pursuant To Supplemental Rule B. Attorney Rose, Bradley added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Bradley)
July 28, 2022 Filing 7 PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT ISSUED (Benson, A.)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 07/28/22 GRANTING #5 Ex Parte Application Authorizing Issuance of Process of Maritime attachment and Garnishment. (Benson, A.)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Thorco Projects A/S for Issuance Of Process Of Maritime Attachment And Garnishment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Process Of Maritime Attachment And Garnishment)(Brucculeri, Frank)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
July 28, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Frank C. Brucculeri* *723 Palisades Beach Rd* *Suite 108* *Santa Monica, CA 90402*. (Coll, A)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Thorco Projects A/S. (Brucculeri, Frank)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc. by Thorco Projects A/S. Attorney Brucculeri, Frank C. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10349927) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brucculeri, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorco Projects A/S v. Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thorco Projects A/S
Represented By: Bradley Rose
Represented By: Frank C. Brucculeri
Represented By: Briton P. Sparkman, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrion Feeds North America, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Brooke Wilgus, PHV
Represented By: Noe Sebastian Hamra, PHV
Represented By: Wei Lun Allen Ho
Represented By: William Robert Bennett, III, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?