(PC)Driver v. Chavez
Plaintiff: Billy Driver, Jr
Defendant: Chavez
Case Number: 2:2022cv01447
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/12/2022 RECOMMENDING Plaintiff's #6 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be denied and that this action be dismissed without prejudice to refiling upon pre-payments of the filing fees therefor; and Plaintiff's #5 motion for injunctive relief be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Findings and Recommendations served on Billy Driver Jr. (Yin, K)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/02/22 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge and to update the docket to reflect the new case number. U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller randomly assigned to this action. The new case number is 2:22-cv-1447 KJM DMC (PC).(Plummer, M)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:22-cv-1447 KJM DMC (PC). (Plummer, M)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order, served on Billy Driver Jr. (Plummer, M)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Billy Driver, Jr (Her, Shelly)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Billy Driver, Jr, CDC D-35391 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Billy Driver, Jr. (Zignago, K.)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for INJUNCTION by Billy Driver, Jr. (Zignago, K.)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST to be placed in a single cell by Billy Driver, Jr (Perdue, C.)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 08/18/22 ORDERING plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Plummer, M)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Billy Driver Jr. (Plummer, M)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Billy Driver Jr. (Licea Chavez, V)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 9/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Licea Chavez, V)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Chavez by Billy Driver, Jr.(Licea Chavez, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Driver v. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Driver, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?