Kearbey et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Pinki Kearbey and Hank Broderson
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01522
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 11/3/2023 EXTENDING the filing deadline of Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses to 1/10/2024. (Clemente Licea, O)
October 31, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to continue jurisdiction by Hank Broderson, Pinki Kearbey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 11/2/2023 (York, M).
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT dated *10/5/2023* pursuant to order signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 10/4/2023 #17 in favor of Plaintiffs, pursuant to FRCP 68. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
September 28, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Judgment by Hank Broderson, Pinki Kearbey. (Attachments: #1 proposed judgment)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 9/29/2023 (Reader, L).
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/2023 ORDERING Dispositive Motions filed by 3/15/2024, Hearing on such motions shall be on 5/7/2024 at 1:30 PM. Discovery due by 11/22/2023. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 9/29/2023, Expert Rebuttal Disclosure by 10/13/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez, and Jury Trial set for 8/26/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez.(Reader, L)
January 20, 2023 Filing 15 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Hank Broderson, Pinki Kearbey. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 6, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 1/6/2023: The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report pursuant to the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26, in accordance with Local Rule 240 and the Court's Order Requiring Service of Process and Joint Status Report, within fourteen (14) days. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Hank Broderson, Pinki Kearbey. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 21, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
September 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
September 21, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
September 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Hugret, Spencer Peter added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
September 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ali Azemoon on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Azemoon, Ali added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Greg Gruzman on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Gruzman, Greg added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hailey Rogerson on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Rogerson, Hailey added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
September 2, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: FCA US LLC served on 8/31/2022, answer due 9/21/2022. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *Strategic Legal Practices, Apc* *1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Coll, A)
August 30, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hank Broderson, Pinki Kearbey (Dolin, Tionna)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC by Pinki Kearbey, Hank Broderson. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10413646) (Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearbey et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinki Kearbey
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hank Broderson
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Hailey Rogerson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?