Zurich American Ins. Co. v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC Doing business as Amazon.com LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01559
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/19/2022 SETTING the follow: Fact Discovery due no later than 7/31/2023; Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due no later than 8/30/2023; Rebuttal to expert witnesses due on or before 9/29/2023; All expert discovery due no later than 10/30/2023; All motions shall be filed on or before 12/14/2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2024 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd by ZOOM; and Bench Trial set for 8/26/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Perdue, C.)
October 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mervin Ray Hartman, III on behalf of Amazon.com Services, LLC. Attorney Hartman, Mervin Ray added. (Hartman, Mervin)
October 12, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Benson, Susan)
September 30, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:22-CV-1559-DAD-AC. (Rodriguez, E)
September 27, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Feng, Simon)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/27/22 DIRECTING Defendant to Show Cause in Writing by 10/07/22 why they have not filed their consent/decline form.(Licea Chavez, V) Modified on 10/5/2022 (Licea Chavez, V).
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, Susan)
September 13, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER by Amazon.com Services, LLC.(Feng, Simon)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
September 6, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Amazon.com Services LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Feng, Simon)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00322548-CU-PO-GDS by Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10424587) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Feng, Simon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Ins. Co. v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Mary Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC Doing business as Amazon.com LLC
Represented By: Simon M. Feng
Represented By: Mervin Ray Hartman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?