(PC) Price v. Pacheco et al
Plaintiff: JoAnn Price and Estate of Ronnie Price
Defendant: Arturo Pacheco, Ashley Marie Aurich, Jeffrey Lynch and Beverly Dapremont
Case Number: 2:2022cv01610
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:22-cv-1610-DAD-DMC (PC). (Huang, H)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/18/2022. (Huang, H)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ashley Marie Aurich, Jeffrey Lynch, Arturo Pacheco* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark Redmond* *Law Offices of Mark A. Redmond* *656 5th Ave., Suite R* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Huang, H)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/18/2022 FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendants: *Arturo Pacheco*, *Ashley Marie Aurich*,*Jeffrey Lynch*. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order served via email on CDCR. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate Beverly Dapremont as a defendant to this action. (Attachments: #1 CDCR Notice of Waiver) (Huang, H)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mark Redmond on behalf of Estate of Ronnie Price, JoAnn Price. Attorney Redmond, Mark added. (Redmond, Mark)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by JoAnn Price, Estate of Ronnie Price. Attorney Daly, Kresta Nora added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10438874) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daly, Kresta)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. (Licea Chavez, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Price v. Pacheco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Price
Represented By: Kresta Nora Daly
Represented By: Mark Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ronnie Price
Represented By: Kresta Nora Daly
Represented By: Mark Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Marie Aurich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dapremont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?