(PS) Legardy v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Fletcher Sherman Legardy
Defendant: State of California, County of Sacramento, City of Sacramento and Sacramento Kings
Case Number: 2:2022cv01881
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/17/2022 DENYING #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Reader, L)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Fletcher Sherman Legardy. (Reader, L)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Fletcher Sherman Legardy. (Kaminski, H)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/26/2022 GRANTING the #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that all claims against all defendants should be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Spichka, K.)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Fletcher Sherman Legardy. (Spichka, K.)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Rodriguez, E)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Fletcher Sherman Legardy. (Rodriguez, E)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Sacramento, County of Sacramento, Sacramento Kings, State of California by Fletcher Sherman Legardy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Legardy v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fletcher Sherman Legardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Kings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?