Gurudu-Group LLC v. RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gurudu-Group LLC
Defendant: RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC, Robinsons Automation Machinery Limited and Mino Automation USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01973
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER re #1 Complaint by Gurudu-Group LLC. (Sadat, Arash) Modified on 12/29/2022 (Kirksey Smith, K).
December 29, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Robinsons Automation Machinery Limited on 12/23/2022. (Sadat, Arash)
December 26, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC by Gurudu-Group LLC. (Sadat, Arash) Modified on 12/27/2022 (Benson, A.).
December 19, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION for EXTENSION of TIME to File Answer by Gurudu-Group LLC. (Sadat, Arash) Modified on 12/20/2022 (Licea Chavez, V). Modified on 12/20/2022 (Kirksey Smith, K).
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC re #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Donovan, Dwight) Modified on 12/16/2022 (Reader, L).
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC re #9 MOTION to DISMISS. (Donovan, Dwight)
December 14, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Bruce Robinson in support of #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Donovan, Dwight)
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC. Attorney Donovan, Dwight Craig added. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Donovan, Dwight)
December 9, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION for EXTENSION of time to respond to complaint by Gurudu-Group LLC. (Sadat, Arash) Modified on 12/9/2022 (Kirksey Smith, K).
December 1, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC served on 11/23/2022. (Sadat, Arash) Modified on 12/5/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mino Automation USA Inc. served on 11/04/2022. (Sadat, Arash) Modified on 11/18/2022 (Reader, L).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/15/2022 GRANTING #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Gabriela Menna Barreto Scanlon, PHV for Gurudu-Group LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Perdue, C.)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Gurudu-Group LLC for attorney Gabriela Menna Barreto Scanlon to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10546832) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sadat, Arash)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mino Automation USA Inc., RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC, Robinsons Automation Machinery Limited* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Arash Sadat* *Mills Sadat Dowlat LLP* *333 South Hope St, 40th Fl* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Kastilahn, A)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Gurudu-Group LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10524932) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1)(Sadat, Arash)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurudu-Group LLC v. RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurudu-Group LLC
Represented By: Arash Sadat
Represented By: Gabriela Menna Barreto Scanlon, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM Robinsons Automation Machinery LLC
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinsons Automation Machinery Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mino Automation USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?