Levison v. Healthcare Recruitment Link, LLC
Plaintiff: Regina Levison Doing business as Levison Search Associates
Defendant: Healthcare Recruitment Link, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01993
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Regina Levison. (Brinegar, Matthew)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/18/2022 ORDERING within 30 days of this order, the parties shall discuss, in person or by telephone, their obligations to transmit mandatory disclosures to the other parties and within 7 days after the parties' discussion on mandatory disclosures, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report. (Rodriguez, E)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/16/2022: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:22-cv-1993 KJN.(Kastilahn, A)
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Campbell, Mark)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Healthcare Recruitment Link, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Campbell, Mark)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Brinegar, Matthew)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from El Dorado County Superior Court, case number 22CV1160 by Healthcare Recruitment Link, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCAEDC-10531024) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Campbell, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levison v. Healthcare Recruitment Link, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Levison Doing business as Levison Search Associates
Represented By: Matthew Allen Brinegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Recruitment Link, LLC
Represented By: Mark A Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?