(SS) Mercado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Mercado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2022cv02155
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Konoski, Bryan)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/14/22 GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Bryan Konoski, PHV for Maria Mercado. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Maria Mercado for attorney Bryan Konoski to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10587600) (Chen, Michael)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 3/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
December 7, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *90* days. Attorney *Michael Chen* *Law Firm of Michael Chen* *431 N. Alhambra Ave., Apt. A* *Monterey Park, CA 91755*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/06/22 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING E-Service on the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk shall issue a summons and serve this order, summons, complaint and Scheduling Order on the Commissioner of Social Security. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Maria Mercado. (Chen, Michael)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Maria Mercado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chen, Michael)
December 5, 2022 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Mercado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Mercado
Represented By: Michael Chen
Represented By: Bryan Konoski, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?