Trove Brands, LLC v. TRRS Magnate LLC
Plaintiff: Trove Brands, LLC a Utah limited liability company Doing business as The Blenderbottle Company
Defendant: TRRS Magnate LLC Doing business as Hydra Cup
Case Number: 2:2022cv02222
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/24/23 EXTENDING date for defendant to respond to Complaint to 02/13/23. (Benson, A.)
January 23, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by TRRS Magnate LLC. Attorney Waldon, Clark Alexander added. (Waldon, Clark) Modified on 1/24/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
January 5, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christian C. Boettcher on behalf of Trove Brands, LLC. Attorney Boettcher, Christian C. added. (Boettcher, Christian)
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond To Initial Complaint by Trove Brands, LLC. (Rosenbaum, Jacob) Modified on 1/5/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jacob Rosenbaum on behalf of Trove Brands, LLC. Attorney Rosenbaum, Jacob added. (Rosenbaum, Jacob)
January 4, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
January 4, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:22-cv-2222 TLN CKD. (Benson, A.)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Razai, Ali)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: TRRS Magnate LLC served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Razai, Ali)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *TRRS Magnate LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ali S Razai* *Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP* *2040 Main Street, 14th Floor* *Irvine, CA 92614*. (Coll, A)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* D510,235 * * 10/04/2005 * * Runway Blue, LLC * Patent #2:* D696,551 * * 12/31/13 * * Runway Blue, LLC * Patent #3:* D697,798 * * 01/21/14 * * Runway Blue, LLC * ; copy of Complaint and Patent Report emailed to U.S. Office of Patents and Trademarks. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Patent Report, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
December 14, 2022 Filing 4 PATENT/TRADEMARK REPORT by Trove Brands, LLC. (Razai, Ali)
December 14, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trove Brands, LLC. (Razai, Ali)
December 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Trove Brands, LLC. (Razai, Ali)
December 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRRS Magnate LLC by Trove Brands, LLC. Attorney Razai, Ali S added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10599514) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Razai, Ali)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trove Brands, LLC v. TRRS Magnate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trove Brands, LLC a Utah limited liability company Doing business as The Blenderbottle Company
Represented By: Ali S Razai
Represented By: Christian C. Boettcher
Represented By: Jacob Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRRS Magnate LLC Doing business as Hydra Cup
Represented By: Clark Alexander Waldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?