USA v. C F Koehnen & Sons, Inc.
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: C F Koehnen & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022mc00216
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
2 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Service by United States of America. (Matchison, Amy)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/2/22 ORDERING the respondent C F Koehnen to appear at the Show Cause Hearing set for 10/5/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; and show show cause why it should not be compelled to obey the Internal Revenue Service summonses served upon it. A copy of this Order, together with the Petition, Declaration of Robyn M. Ricciuti-Culp and its exhibits, shall be served upon the respondent within 30 days of the date that this Order is served upon counsel for the United States or as soon thereafter as possible. The Court hereby appoints Revenue Agent Robyn M. Ricciuti-Culp to effect service in this case. Service may also be effected by the United States marshal or deputy marshal. Proof of any service shall be filed with the Clerk as soon as practicable. If the respondent has any defense to present or opposition to the petition, such defense or opposition shall be made in writing and filed with the Clerk of Court and copies served on counsel for the United States in Washington D.C., at least 21 days prior to the date set for the show cause hearing. The United States may file a response memorandum to any opposition at least 5 court days prior to the date set for the show cause hearing. The respondent may notify the Court, in a writing filed with the Clerk and served on counsel for the United States in Washington, D.C., at least 14 days prior to the date set for the show cause hearing, that the respondent has no objection to enforcement of the summons. The respondent's appearance at the hearing will then be excused. The respondent is hereby notified that failure to comply with this Order may subject it to sanctions for contempt of court. (Kastilahn, A)
July 13, 2022 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED - Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (Zignago, K.)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION to ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS by United States of America. Attorney Matchison, Amy Talburt added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Robyn Ricciuti-Culp, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matchison, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. C F Koehnen & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Amy Talburt Matchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C F Koehnen & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?