Stokes v. Skyfineusa , LLC
Plaintiff: Adam Stokes
Defendant: Skyfineusa, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00065
Filed: January 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER by Skyfineusa, LLC.(Savage, Greggory)
January 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Skyfineusa, LLC re #8 Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice. (Herrera, Gabriel) Modified on 1/27/2023 (Perdue, C.).
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Skyfineusa, LLC re #9 Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice. (Herrera, Gabriel) Modified on 1/27/2023 (Perdue, C.).
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/25/2023 GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Greggory J. Savage, PHV for Skyfineusa, LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Spichka, K.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/25/2023 GRANTING #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Gregory S. Roberts, PHV for Skyfineusa, LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Spichka, K.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Skyfineusa, LLC for attorney Gregory S. Roberts to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10662616) (Herrera, Gabriel)
January 25, 2023 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Skyfineusa, LLC for attorney Gregory S. Savage to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10662563) (Herrera, Gabriel)
January 12, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Skyfineusa, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Herrera, Gabriel)
January 12, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Skyfineusa, LLC re #2 Civil New Case Documents for WBS. (Herrera, Gabriel)
January 12, 2023 Filing 3 PROOF of SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal by Skyfineusa, LLC. (Herrera, Gabriel) Modified on 1/13/2023 (Coll, A).
January 12, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
January 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00324073 by Skyfineusa, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10640351) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration)(Herrera, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. Skyfineusa , LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Stokes
Represented By: Matthew Robert Schoech
Represented By: Glen A. Van Dyke
Represented By: Megan Denise DeHerrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyfineusa, LLC
Represented By: Gabriel P. Herrera
Represented By: Greggory J. Savage, PHV
Represented By: Gregory S. Roberts, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?