Nance v. Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiffeny Nance
Defendant: Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. and Ryder System, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00477
Filed: March 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Troy L Nunley
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/9/2023: The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Objections and Request to Modify the Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. #21 ). The Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. #18 ) is MODIFIED as follows: The deadline to complete Phase 1 Precertification Discovery is EXTENDED to 270 days from the date of the Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order filed on 4/18/2023. All other deadlines in the Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order are calculated based on the new discovery deadline. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
May 2, 2023 Filing 21 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Tiffeny Nance to #18 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Zinovyev)(Zinovyev, Eugene) Modified on 5/3/2023 (Benson, A.).
April 18, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tanner Hendershot on behalf of Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder System, Inc.. Attorney Hendershot, Tanner added. (Hendershot, Tanner)
April 18, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy N. Cannarozzi for Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/18/2023: Per the 15 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, the initial scheduling conference previously set for 5/18/2023 #12 is VACATED. (Text Only Entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 04/18/23 for PHASE I - CLASS CERTIFICATION: all discovery in Phase I shall be limited to facts that are relevant to whether this action should be certified as a class action and shall be completed within 240 days; Designation of Experts for class certification purposes due no later than 60 days after the close of discovery with any supplemental designations due 30 days thereafter; Motion for Class Certification shall be filed no later than 180 days after the close of certification discovery; all other necessary dates and deadlines will be set by a Supplemental Pretrial Scheduling Order after the Court's ruling on the Class Certification Motion. Objections due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
April 17, 2023 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT of Case Type Per #16 Court's Initial Pre-Trial Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder System, Inc. Attorney Tumanyan, Rafael N. added. (Tumanyan, Rafael) Modified on 4/18/2023 (Benson, A.).
April 14, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
April 14, 2023 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-0477-TLN-JDP. (Rodriguez, E)
April 14, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Zinovyev, Eugene)
April 13, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Curtis, Mara)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/8/2023 ORDERING Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 10:00 AM, Via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall complete and file the Consent to Assignment or Request for Reassignment form #4 . (Reader, L)
April 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:22-cv-00267, 2:22-cv-02490 by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder System, Inc.. (Curtis, Mara)
April 6, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder System, Inc.. (Curtis, Mara)
April 6, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder System, Inc.. Attorney Curtis, Mara D. added.(Curtis, Mara)
March 24, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ori Edelstein on behalf of Tiffeny Nance. Attorney Edelstein, Ori added. (Edelstein, Ori)
March 24, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Carolyn H. Cottrell on behalf of Tiffeny Nance. Attorney Cottrell, Carolyn H. added. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
March 23, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ryder System, Inc. served on 3/20/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (Zinovyev, Eugene)
March 23, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. served on 3/17/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Zinovyev, Eugene)
March 14, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
March 14, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder System, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Eugene Zinovyev* *Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky, LLP* *2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400* *Emeryville, California 94608*. (Reader, L)
March 13, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Tiffeny Nance (Zinovyev, Eugene)
March 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., Ryder System, Inc. by Tiffeny Nance. Attorney Zinovyev, Eugene added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10744849) (Zinovyev, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nance v. Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffeny Nance
Represented By: Eugene Zinovyev
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Mara D. Curtis
Represented By: Rafael N. Tumanyan
Represented By: Tanner Hendershot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder System, Inc.
Represented By: Mara D. Curtis
Represented By: Rafael N. Tumanyan
Represented By: Tanner Hendershot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?