(PS) Niravanh et al v. Durham et al
Plaintiff: Leuang Lotakoon Niravanh and Somsack Niravanh
Defendant: Adriana Durham, The Mortgage Law Firm, PHH Mortgage Corp. and California Reconveyance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00713
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/21/23 DENYING #7 Motion for TRO. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 21, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Leuang Lotakoon Niravanh, Somsack Niravanh. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 20, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of LIS PENDENS by Somsack Niravanh (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Leuang Lotakoon Niravanh, Somsack Niravanh. (Attachments: #1 TRO Checklist)(Benson, A.)
April 20, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Reconveyance Company, Adriana Durham, PHH Mortgage Corp., The Mortgage Law Firm* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Leuang Lotakoon Niravanh/Somsack Niravanh* *2205 Hilltop Drive Num 187* *Redding, CA 96002*. (Benson, A.)
April 20, 2023 SERVICE AT FRONT COUNTER: #6 Amended Summons, served on Leuang Lotakoon Niravanh, Somsack Niravanh. (Benson, A.)
April 18, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 18, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Reconveyance Company, Adriana Durham, PHH Mortgage Corp., The Mortgage Law Firm* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Leuang Lotakoon Niravahn* *Somsack Niravahn* *2205 Hilltop Drive Num 187* *Redding, CA 96002*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 18, 2023 Filing 3 ***DISREGARDED*** SEE #5 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 4/18/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 18, 2023 Filing 2 ***DISREGARDED*** SEE #4 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Reconveyance Company, Adriana Durham, PHH Mortgage Corp., The Mortgage Law Firm* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Leuang Lotakoon Niravahn* *Somsack Niravahn* *2205 Hilltop Drive Num 187* *Redding, CA 96002*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 4/18/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Reconveyance Company, Adriana Durham, PHH Mortgage Corp., The Mortgage Law Firm by Leuang Lotakoon Niravahn, Somsack Niravahn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 18, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Summons, #5 Civil New Case Documents for DAD served on Somsack Niravanh, Leuang Lotakoon Niravanh. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 18, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Summons, #3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD served on Leuang Lotakoon Niravahn, Somsack Niravahn. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 18, 2023 RECEIPT number 200000525 for $402.00 from Somsack Niravahn. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Niravanh et al v. Durham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leuang Lotakoon Niravanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Somsack Niravanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mortgage Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?