(PC) Corral v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Dylan Corral and Dylan Scott Corral
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2023cv01058
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
2 Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-01058-DAD-CKD (PC). (Lopez, K)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Dylan Scott Corral. (Lopez, K)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lopez, K)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Dylan Scott Corral. (Lopez, K)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/06/2023 for #6 Order. Consent or Decline due by 8/10/2023. (Spichka, K.)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/05/2023 GRANTING the #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Motion to Proceed IFP or the required filing fee of $402 due within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and #7 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Dylan Scott Corral. (Spichka, K.)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File IFP and Consent form by Dylan Scott Corral. (Clemente Licea, O)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/12/2023 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $402.00.(Huang, H)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP Application served on Dylan Scott Corral. (Huang, H)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/9/2023 REASSIGNING this case to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman no longer assigned to case. New Case Number is 2:23-cv-1058 CKD (PC).(Yin, K)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order Reassigning Case served on Dylan Scott Corral. (Yin, K)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on Dylan Scott Corral with corrected no. 4992013 (confirmed with SCMJ locator). (Yin, K)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 7/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Woodson, A)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Dylan Corral. (Woodson, A)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, John Doe by Dylan Corral.(Woodson, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Corral v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Corral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Scott Corral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?