(PS) Mouhab v. JP Morgan Chase Bank
Plaintiff: Ismael Mouhab
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 2:2023cv01431
Filed: July 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Troy L Nunley
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Nair, Christopher)
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/18/2023. New Case Number 2:23-cv-01431-TLN-JDP. Old Case Number 1:23-cv-01055-JLT-EPG. (Marrujo, C)
July 18, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Ismael Mouhab. (Marrujo, C)
July 14, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ismael Mouhab. (Marrujo, C)
July 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank by Ismael Mouhab. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)
July 14, 2023 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Mouhab v. JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Mouhab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?