(PC) Warfield v. Tibbet et al
Plaintiff: Broderick James Warfield
Defendant: Walt Tibbet, Donald A. duBain, Krishna A. Abrams, Elana D'Agustino, Oscar Bobrow, Gagan Mall and Karen Phillips
Case Number: 2:2023cv01546
Filed: July 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXHIBIT A1 re: City of Fairfield Police Report by Broderick James Warfield. (Nair, C)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion for Post-Judgment Relief by Broderick James Warfield. Attachments: #1 Notice of Undisputed Facts. (Nair, C)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/18/2023 DENYING as moot plaintiff's #9 , #11 requests to file sealed documents and #13 motion for discovery. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed ifp be denied as moot, plaintiff's #12 third amended complaint be dismissed without leave to amend, and plaintiff's #14 motion for a temporary restraining order be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 20 days. (Yin, K)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order, Findings and Recommendations served on Broderick James Warfield. (Yin, K)
September 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Broderick James Warfield. (Attachments: #1 TRO Checklist, #2 Proof of Service) (Clemente Licea, O)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for DISCOVERY and REQUEST FOR COPY by Broderick James Warfield. (Woodson, A) [Response Sent: If you wish to have a conformed copy returned to you, you must file an original plus 2 copies and provide the court with a self-addressed stamped envelope with the correct postage.] Modified on 9/7/2023 (Huang, H).
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 THIRD AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Broderick James Warfield. (Clemente Licea, O)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST to Submit Electronically Sealed Documents by Broderick James Warfield. (Clemente Licea, O)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants.(Lopez, K)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Broderick James Warfield. (Lopez, K)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Request to Submit Sealed Documents pursuant to L.R. 141 by Broderick James Warfield. (Lopez, K)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-01546-KJM-DB. (Lopez, K)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lopez, K)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Nair, Christopher)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Broderick James Warfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clemente Licea, O)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 9/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Clemente Licea, O)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Broderick James Warfield. (Clemente Licea, O)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROOF of SERVICE by Broderick James Warfield re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Motion for IFP. (Clemente Licea, O)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Broderick James Warfield. (Clemente Licea, O)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Krishna A. Abrams, Oscar Bobrow, Elana D'Agustino, Gagan Mall, Karen Phillips, Walt Tibbet, Donald A. duBain by Broderick James Warfield.(Clemente Licea, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Warfield v. Tibbet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broderick James Warfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Tibbet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald A. duBain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krishna A. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elana D'Agustino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Bobrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gagan Mall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?