Shreckengost v. SWCA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ranie Shreckengost
Defendant: SWCA, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2023cv01617
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to SWCA, Incorporated on 9/12/2023, Answer due 11/13/2023 (Hogg, William)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against SWCA, Incorporated by Ranie Shreckengost.(Hogg, William)
August 30, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by SWCA, Incorporated. Attorney Robinson Bours, Ricardo added. (Robinson Bours, Ricardo) Modified on 8/31/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
August 17, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: SWCA, Incorporated served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Hogg, William)
August 7, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
August 7, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *SWCA, Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William M. Hogg* *Josephson Dunlap, LLP* *11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050* *Houston, Texas 77046*. (Reader, L)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SWCA, Incorporated by Ranie Shreckengost. Attorney Hogg, William M. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11000249) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hogg, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shreckengost v. SWCA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranie Shreckengost
Represented By: William M. Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWCA, Incorporated
Represented By: Ricardo Robinson Bours
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?