(PC) Miller v. Lynch et al
Plaintiff: Elijah Lee Miller
Defendant: J. Lynch, A. Scotland and CDCR
Case Number: 2:2023cv02145
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lopez, K)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Nair, C)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on Elijah Lee Miller at MCSP. (Spichka, K.)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Mule Creek State Prison, P.O. Box 409099, Ione, CA 95640 by Elijah Lee Miller. (Woodson, A)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 11/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Xiong, J.)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:23-cv-01856.
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Elijah Lee Miller. (Xiong, J.)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Case transferred to Eastern District of California. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2023) [Transferred from cand on 9/29/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 9/27/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/29/2023.]
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elijah Lee Miller. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2023) [Transferred from cand on 9/29/2023.]
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CDCR, J. Lynch, A. Scotland. Filed byElijah Lee Miller. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2023) [Transferred from cand on 9/29/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Miller v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Lee Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Scotland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?