Sharpe v. Werner Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sharpe
Defendant: Werner Co., New Werner Co., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Doing business as Lowe's Home Improvement Warehouse and Lowes Companies Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02239
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Filing 16 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL Stipulated Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Werner Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terhar, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/27/23. (Licea Chavez, V)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) by Jennifer Sharpe. (Slaughter, Todd)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 11/17/23 ORDERING parties to serve initial disclosures by 11/21/23; all fact Discovery completed by 10/15/24; Designation of Expert Witnesses by plaintiff due 10/22/24, by defendants due 11/12/24; any rebuttal expert disclosures by plaintiff due 11/25/24 and by defendants due 12/13/24 and all expert discovery completed by 01/17/25; a joint mid-litigation statement due 06/07/24; Dispositive motions filed by 03/28/25 and noticed for hearing 05/15/25 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/31/25 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta with a joint pretrial statement filed in compliance with Local Rule 281 and Judge Calabretta's Standing Order; Jury Trial set for 09/29/25 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. Objections due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
November 17, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Werner Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terhar, Michael)
November 17, 2023 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Werner Co.. (Terhar, Michael)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 6, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-02239-DJC-DMC. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Werner Co.. (Terhar, Michael)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Jennifer Sharpe. (Slaughter, Todd)
November 3, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Slaughter, Todd)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Werner Co. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Terhar, Michael)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE of #1 #2 and #3 by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Werner Co. (Terhar, Michael) Modified on 10/6/2023 (Benson, A.).
October 5, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
October 5, 2023 Filing 2 (DISREGARD and REFER to #3 Amended Civil New Case Documents) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 10/5/2023 (Kastilahn, A).
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Butte County Superior Court, case number 23CV02135 by Werner Co. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11114252) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Werner Co's Corporate Disclosure, #4 Lowe's Home Centers LLC's Corporate Disclosure)(Terhar, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharpe v. Werner Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Terhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Werner Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Terhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Doing business as Lowe's Home Improvement Warehouse
Represented By: Michael J. Terhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sharpe
Represented By: Todd Slaughter
Represented By: Todd E. Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?