USA v. Genesis Systems International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Genesis Systems International, Inc. and Jonathan Valdez
Case Number: 2:2023cv02261
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 12/05/23 EXTENDING the time for the Defendants to answer from 12/05/23 to 01/02/24. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Dallo on behalf of Jonathan Valdez. (Dallo, Michael)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Dallo on behalf of Genesis Systems International, Inc.. (Dallo, Michael)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint by United States of America. (Lee, Alice)
November 16, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jonathan Valdez served on 11/14/2023. (Lee, Alice)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Genesis Systems International, Inc. served on 11/14/2023. (Lee, Alice)
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
October 6, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Genesis Systems International, Inc., Jonathan Valdez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alice Lee, GOVT* *DOJ-Tax* *PO Box 683, Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Kastilahn, A)
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction and to Reduce to Judgment Tax Assessments against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Lee, Alice added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Genesis Systems International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alice Lee, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Systems International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Dallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Valdez
Represented By: Michael Dallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?