Stincelli v. USA
Plaintiff: Carl A. Stincelli
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2023cv02325
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kelly, Timothy)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Office of Chief Counsel served on 11/27/23 by Carl A. Stincelli. (Kelly, Timothy) Modified on 12/14/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Carl A. Stincelli. Attorney General of the United States served on 11/27/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Kelly, Timothy) Modified on 12/14/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Carl A. Stincelli. Civil-Process Clerk served on 12/7/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Kelly, Timothy) Modified on 12/14/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/13/2023 SETTING an Initial Scheduling Conference for 1/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 1/12/2024. (Donati, J)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy p for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/9/2023: The Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 2/27/2024 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the setting of an Initial Scheduling Conference is REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge. The parties' shall file their joint scheduling report no later than fourteen (14) days before the new Initial Scheduling Conference date set before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Buzo, P)
October 16, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 2/27/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Timothy Edward Kelly* *Law Office of Tim Kelly* *7801 N. Pershing Ave.* *Stockton, CA 95207*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America by Carl A. Stincelli. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11130817) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kelly, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stincelli v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl A. Stincelli
Represented By: Timothy Edward Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?