USA v. Tindall et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thomas A Tindall and Siskiyou County
Case Number: 2:2023cv02533
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6502 IRS:Enforcement of tax liens
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/20/2023 re #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, January 24, 2024 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J) Modified on 12/20/2023 (Anderson, J).
December 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION REQUESTING APPROVAL of STIPUATION re Relative Priority of Liens by USA. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koven, Cassondra) Modified on 12/20/2023 (Benson, A.).
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Thomas A Tindall served on 11/18/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Koven, Cassondra)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of LIS PENDENS by United States of America. (Koven, Cassondra)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Siskiyou County, Thomas A Tindall* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Cassondra Koven, GOVT* *U.S. Department of Justice* *950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.* *Washington, DC 20530*. (Licea Chavez, V)
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Siskiyou County, Thomas A Tindall by United States of America. Attorney Koven, Cassondra added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koven, Cassondra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Tindall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cassondra Koven, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siskiyou County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?