J&H Marine, Inc. v. R/V Polecat's Revenge et al
Plaintiff: J&H Marine, Inc.
Defendant: R/V Polecat's Revenge and Joseph Duran Norman
Case Number: 2:2023cv02550
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Joseph Duran Norman served on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Kelley, Max)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: R/V Polecat's Revenge served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (Kelley, Max)
November 6, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Joseph Duran Norman, R/V Polecat's Revenge* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Max L. Kelley* *Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin & Hansen, LLP* *900 Front Street, Suite 350* *San Francisco, California 94111*. (Reader, L)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 [DIDREGARD SEE [ #8 ] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L) Modified on 11/6/2023 (Reader, L).
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST for Warrant for Arrest of Vessel by U.S. Marshal by J&H Marine, Inc. re #4 Ex Parte Application. (Kelley, Max)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 EX PARTE APPLICATION by J&H Marine, Inc. for Order Directing Issuance of Warrant of Maritime Arrest. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Max)
November 3, 2023 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION by J&H Marine, Inc. for Order Appointing Substitute Custodian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Koster, #2 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Max)
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by J&H Marine, Inc. (Kelley, Max)
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against Joseph Duran Norman, R/V Polecat's Revenge, in rem, by J&H Marine, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11168396) (Kelley, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&H Marine, Inc. v. R/V Polecat's Revenge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&H Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Max Lee Kelley
Represented By: Iris He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R/V Polecat's Revenge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Duran Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?