(PC) Khademi v. Newsome et al
Plaintiff: Davood Khademi
Defendant: Gavin Newsome, City Council and Immigration Naturalization, Services (INS)
Case Number: 2:2023cv02743
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 01/16/2024 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff has 30 days from the service of this Order in which to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order.(Lopez, K)
January 17, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Davood Khademi. (Lopez, K)
December 15, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Nair, C)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Murphy, J)
November 28, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Davood Khademi. (Murphy, J)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Davood Khademi. (Murphy, J)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against City Council, Immigration Naturalization, Services (INS), Gavin Newsome by Davood Khademi.(Murphy, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Khademi v. Newsome et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davood Khademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration Naturalization, Services (INS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?